Case Information: 34928 | |||
Short Caption: | KARIGIANES (MARK) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C104121 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/22/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/05/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
10/05/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-09537 | |
11/12/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34922, 34923, 34928, 34942, 34949, 34990, 35002, 35006. | 99-11149 | |
02/22/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on: 02/17/00. | 00-02748 | |
02/22/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/30/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B0-CY/DA/ML | 00-08986 | |
06/27/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-11022 | |
06/27/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/15/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2000. | 00-11022 |