judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00973-CR
05-89-00973-CR
08/15/1989
Other Felony
Hill, Ruby Jewell
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2020Order enteredDestroy
10/09/2000Record RetentionDestroy
10/05/1990Mandate Issued
10/05/1990Mandate Issued
07/13/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/13/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submitted
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submitted
04/11/1990MattConv
02/02/1990Case ready to be set
02/02/1990Exhibits Filed
02/02/1990Case ready to be set
01/25/1990Brief Filed
01/05/1990Mot Ext Time Sup Sfacts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/27/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/15/1989Mot Ext Time File Sup Sfacts
11/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/28/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/07/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/03/1989Brief Filed
11/03/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/02/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/29/1989Transcript Filed
09/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/09/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/09/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Ron Chapman
F88-95917-LH
2 yrs TDC Probated