judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREENE VS. NICKEL

Case Information: 34929
Short Caption:GREENE VS. NICKELCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CF9710003Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/14/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09544
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-09670
10/14/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 10/11/99. 99-09989
10/14/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/13/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response demonstrating why this court should not reverse the district court's order entered on June 1, 1998. 00-05963
05/15/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. (Respondents' Answering Brief). 00-08004
06/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. fn4[We deny appellant's motions received on October 14, 1999, and May 22, 2000, to file proper person documents, however we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant. We have also considered the response filed by respondents on May 15, 2000.] The district cout erred in denying Greene relief under NRCP 60(b), especially in light of the fact that he showed compliance with the exhaustion requirement. "We therefore reverse the order denying the motion for relief from judgment and remand this matter to the district court for entry of an order granting the motion and for further proceedings." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-10099
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11847
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/03/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2000. 00-11847