judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

POLK COUNTY CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, ET AL., RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL. v. TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY

Case: A-4677
A-4677
05/11/1954
Application for Writ of Error
POLK COUNTY CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, ET AL., RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/30/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/28/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/14/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/13/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
05/12/1954Errata FiledRespondent
05/11/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/30/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/28/1954Motion for Rehearing
06/16/1954Letter Filed
05/14/1954Reply to Response
05/13/1954Response to Petition
05/12/1954Errata Filed
05/11/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/11/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railroad Commission of TexasPetitioner
Polk County Chamber of Commerce, et al.Petitioner
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Petitioner
Texas and New Orleans Railroad CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information