judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1160-89
PD-1160-89
08/16/1989
PDR Case Type
MCCOY, JOHN WESLEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/01/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/18/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/16/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/28/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
MCCOY, JOHN WESLEYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Roger Bridgwater
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00408-CR
Aff 6-29-89
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
Honorable Albert Pruett
482443