judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00971-CV
05-89-00971-CV
08/15/1989
Mandamus
McKinnon, David B., John Arnold Carl Beavers, Boyd R. Branch
Merrill Hartman, Judge, 192nd District Court, Dallas County,
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/15/1997Record RetentionDestroy
08/16/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/16/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/15/1989MattConv
08/15/1989Motion for Leave to File
08/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
192nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Merrill L Hartman
88-2169-K