judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00200-CR
09-89-00200-CR
08/16/1989
Burglary
Wood, Ronnie Dale
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/16/1990Mandate Issued
10/09/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
09/12/1990Petition for ReviewRefused
05/10/1990Petition for ReviewFiled in Higher Court
04/26/1990Petition for Review
03/28/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/07/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1990Brief Filed
01/10/1990Case ready to be set
12/14/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/15/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/10/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/17/1989Brief Filed
10/17/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/11/1989Response
10/10/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/24/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
08/18/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/17/1989Transcript Filed
08/16/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/16/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable John C Martin
88-05-284 CR