judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1149-89
PD-1149-89
08/16/1989
PDR Case Type
CARNES, RONNIE GENE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/14/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/03/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/18/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/14/1989RESPONSE FILED
08/16/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/13/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
CARNES, RONNIE GENEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Catherine Greene Burnett
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00397-CR
Aff 6-15-89
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable Joe Kegans
490340