judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1142-89
PD-1142-89
08/16/1989
PDR Case Type
CHAFFIN, CATHY JEAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/18/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/18/1989RESPONSE FILED
08/16/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CHAFFIN, CATHY JEANApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)David K. Wilson
STATE OF TEXASStateRobert T. Jarvis
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00996-CR
Aff 6-29-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Grayson
Honorable Richard B. Pennell
86-1470