judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROHWEDER (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 27617
Short Caption:ROHWEDER (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33116 , 34969 , 36890 , 37486 , 44917 , 46833 , 51574 , 63596 , 67579 , 67579-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C109793Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/25/1995Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 56. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants.)
10/25/1995ExhibitFiled Exhibit (original). Placed in correspondence file.
11/08/1995Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Towne)
11/13/1995Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.
11/29/1995MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Rohweder)
12/04/1995MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Appellant Towne)
12/06/1995BriefFiled Opening Brief. (Appellant Rohweder) (Mailed on: 12/4/95.)
12/19/1995Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Appellant Rohweder)
12/19/1995Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting the motion filed November 29, 1995. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on November 13, 1995, shall be filed, forthwith.
01/03/1996MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Towne's Second Motion.
01/09/1996Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting the motions filed December 4, 1995, and January 3, 1996. The opening brief of appellant Donald Odell Towne, Jr. shall be served and filed on or before February 2, 1996.
01/09/1996MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal.
01/19/1996MotionFiled Stipulation. Extending time to file Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss.
01/25/1996MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. In which to file Appellant's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal.
01/25/1996Other Other. Received Appellant's Opposition to State's Motion to Dismiss.
01/25/1996Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting the motion filed January 25, 1996. The response in opposition provisionally submitted on January 25, 1996, shall be filed.
01/25/1996Other Other. Filed Appellant's Opposition to State's Motion to Dismiss.
02/02/1996MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Towne's Third Request.
03/04/1996Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant Towne has filed a third motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief. We grant the motion. Appellant shall have 10 days form the date of this order to file the opening brief. No further extensions of time shall be permitted.
03/04/1996BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant Towne's Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand deliverd 03/04/96.
04/04/1996BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief to Towne's Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark.
04/12/1996Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Rohweder shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain a written order from the district court resolving his motion and to supplement the record with a certified copy of that order. We decline to rule on the motion to dismiss at this time. The state further contends that Rohweder has improperly challenged in his opening brief the district court's denial of his petition for a post-conviction writ of habeas corpus because he did not file a notice of appeal from the district court's denial of that petition. The state asks this court to refuse to consider this issue in the appeal. We decline to resolve this issue at this time.
04/17/1996Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from the Clark County Clerk. Pursuant to the Supreme Court Order filed April 12, 1996, a copy of the Order denying the post conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus and motion to set aside guilty plea filed July 11, 1995, is included as part of the record pages 1833 and 1834, both defendant's Roheweder and Towne, Jr. are on the pleading.
03/19/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant Roheweder shall have 20 days from the date of this order to obtain from the district court and transmit to this court a written order specifically resolving his motion to set aside his guilty plea. If this court does not receive an adequate response from appellant Rohweder within the time allowed, we will consider his appeal abondend, and we will be constrained to grant the state's motion to dismiss this appeal as to appellant Rohweder.
04/07/1997Other Other. Received copy of Amended Order Denying Defendant Rohweder & Towne's Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post-Conviction) and Motions to Set Aside Guilty Pleas.
07/01/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We deny the state's request to limit this appeal, and we deny the motion to dismiss.
07/17/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an answering brief to appellant Rohweder's opening brief. Thereafter, appellants shall have 30 days to file reply briefs. Extensions of this briefing schedule shall be granted only upon a showing of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances.
07/23/1997BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: express mail.
09/17/1997MotionFiled Motion. and Stipulation for extension of time to file Appellant's (Rwhweder) Reply Brief.
10/20/1997MotionFiled Motion. For Enlargement of Time to file Appellant's Reply Brief.
10/24/1997BriefReceived Reply Brief. (Appellant Rohweder) Mailed on: 10/22/97.
11/20/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We grant Rohweder's motions for extensions of time to file the reply brief. The clerk shall file the reply brief, submitted provisionally on October 23, 1997, forthwith.
11/20/1997BriefFiled Reply Brief. (Rohweder)
08/17/1998MotionFiled Motion. To file Supplemental Opening Brief claiming Lack of Jurisdiction (from counsel for appellant Donald Odell Towne, Jr.).
08/17/1998BriefReceived Supplemental Brief. Appellant Donald Odell Towne's Supplemental Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 08/17/98.
08/31/1998Other Other. Filed Opposition to Motion to File Supplemental Opening Brief Claiming Lack of Jurisdiction.
09/11/1998MotionFiled Motion. To File Reply to the State's Opposition.
09/11/1998Other Other. Received Reply to Opposition.
09/23/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On August 17, 1998, appellant Donald Odell Towne, Jr. moved this court for leave to file a supplemental opening brief. The state opposes the motion. 1[We grant appellant's motion of September 11, 1998, for leave to file a reply to the state's opposition. The clerk shall file the reply provisionally submitted by appellant.] The motion is granted. The clerk shall file the supplemental brief submitted provisionally with the motion. The state shall file and serve a supplemental answering brief within 20 days from the date of this order if it elects to do so. The failure of the state to file a supplemental answering brief will not be construed as a confession of error in any respect.
09/23/1998Other Other. Filed Reply to Opposition.
09/23/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's (Donald Odell Towne, Jr.) Supplemental Opening Brief.
10/13/1998BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark.
12/21/1999Other Other. Resubmitted to Southern Nevada Panel this day. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB.
12/21/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/14/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant-Petitioner's Proper Person Notice and Statement for Fair Presentation & Exhasution. (Received original and 3 copies-1 copy returned). No action required-AH.
03/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB.
03/13/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Judicial/Legal Notice to the Supreme Court. (Received original and two copies-1 copy returned).
03/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On March 2, 2000, we entered an order dismissing this appeal. On March 13, 2000, appellant submitted a document in proper person. Appellant has not been granted leave to file documents in proper person and is represented by counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to return unfiled, the proper person document received in this court on March 13, 2000.
03/27/2000Other Other. Returned Unfiled with letter to appellant Rohweder: original proper person Judicial/Legal Notice to the Supreme Court.
03/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur.
04/18/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Entering Receipt for Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 3, 2000.