judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAROLD A. EDELIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0016
Short Caption:HAROLD A. EDELIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-13715-09Filed Date:01/10/2011

Opening Event Date:01/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:04/13/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/19/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/05/2015
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarold A. EdelinYPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Jonathan W. Anderson NN
Katherine M. KellyYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/16/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (477 pgs/Ronan) 10/12-15/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (16 pgs/tape) 12/28/10 proc. w/cd
02/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/23/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/02/2011RECORD INDEX
03/02/2011RECORD COPIES
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 7/5/11. no oppo
04/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 5, 2011. (JAC)
07/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days no oppo
07/12/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before October. 4, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JJ)
10/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until January 2, 2011 (Appellant)
10/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file brief and the limited appendix to 1/2/12.
12/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/04/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extenion to file brief and limited appendix on 2/2/12.
02/02/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
03/01/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
03/05/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
04/13/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
04/13/2012FiledBriefing Completed
07/02/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/05/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
07/12/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
11/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/28/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/28/2012FiledLetter From Counsel notifying the Court that Atty Gonen will be replacing Atty Semyonova as counsel for arguemnt. (Appellant)
12/10/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's moiton to file reply brief.
12/10/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
12/17/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
12/19/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Nebeker Daniel Gonen, Esq. for appellant Katherine M. Kelly, Esq. for appellee
07/25/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Nebeker )
08/01/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File for rehearing or for rehearing en banc Other (Appellant)Granted
08/16/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET and appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc shall be filed on or before October 7, 2013. (ETW)
10/07/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
10/29/2013FiledOrdered that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
11/08/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File response to appellant's rehearing petition. (Appellee)Granted
11/21/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for extension of time to file the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc (ETW)
01/10/2014FiledOpposition to Petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellee)
02/21/2014FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
09/08/2014FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
12/24/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc
01/02/2015FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
01/05/2015FiledMandate