judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC R. GARDNER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0017
Short Caption:ERIC R. GARDNER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL7761-04Filed Date:01/03/2011

Opening Event Date:01/03/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/10/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric R. Gardner YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Stephen R. Prest NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/03/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL (includes self-styled NOA received in the U.S. Court of Appeals 1/3/11)
01/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 3, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX
01/26/2011RECORD COPIES
01/26/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/02/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (17pgs/Davis) 12/8/10 proc. w/CD
03/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL
03/07/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/07/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
03/09/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
03/09/2011TMC - motion to expedite - motion for summary affirmance
03/10/2011 ORDERED, SS, that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from a NON-FINAL, NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. Appellant's trial court motion was based solely on his belief that the opinion in his direct appeal precludes his re-trial...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
03/10/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE AND APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE ARE DENIED AS MOOT. It is *****MORE*****
03/10/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that since this matter is scheduled for re-trial on MARCH 28, 2011, the CLERK SHALL ISSUE THE MANDATE FORTHWITH. (KROBPR) (rm)
03/10/2011DISMISSED
03/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED