judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMOTHY PAUL SCHAEFFER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0060)
Case Number:S-11-0060Case Docketed On:03/11/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:TIMOTHY PAUL SCHAEFFER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TIMOTHY PAUL SCHAEFFER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTimothy Paul SchaefferDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Sentencing, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 9
Citation:268 P.3d 1045

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/11/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/25/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/26/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/13/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/29/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/23/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/30/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina N. Olson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paul Rehurek for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/26/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Olson, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Paul S. Rehurek, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/26/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/14/2011Record - Received unfiled record requested by CourtRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
01/20/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/07/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/07/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/10/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/9/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal