judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAYCOCK PETROLEUM VS. FRENTZEL

Case Information: 38297
Short Caption:HAYCOCK PETROLEUM VS. FRENTZELCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A436085Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/21/2001 / Aurbach, PhillipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/10/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Ellis & Gordon-check no. 1580.
08/10/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13664
08/21/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/27/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14447
08/30/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Phillip Aurbach.
01/11/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-00846
02/06/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal as to respondent Tom Tonai only.. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss as to respondent Tonai only, or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 02-02449
03/08/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal with Regard to Respondent, Tom Tonai, only. 02-04247
03/26/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation filed on March 8, 2002, this appeal is dismissed as to respondent Tom Tonai only. The clerk of this court shall removed Tom Tonai as respondent from the caption on this court's docket. 02-05336
04/01/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-05817
04/18/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-06911
05/06/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: August 13, 2001 and August 29, 2001. To Court Reporter: Cat Nelson. 02-07927
05/16/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 13, 2001. Court Reporter: Debbie Van Blaricom. 02-08693
05/20/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Supplemental Request. Transcripts requested: 6/21/01, 6/27/01, 7/18/01. To Court Reporter: Cat Nelson. 02-08865
05/30/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. 02-09443
06/10/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/21/01; 06/27/01; 07/18/01 08/13/01; 10/01/01. To Court Reporter: Cat Nelson. 02-10088
07/01/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 02-11283
07/03/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 21, 2001. Court Reporter: Biljana Dokic. 02-11393
08/23/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Dismissing Appeal in Part and Reinstating Briefing. We are not persuaded that we have jurisdiction over the appeal from the fee award whan an appeal from such an order is nowhere authorized by rule or statute. Accordingly, we dismiss this portion of the appeal. We reinstate briefing with respect to the appeal from the order dissolving the injunction. Court reporter Nelson shall have 30 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9(b). Appellant shall have 100 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-14510
10/16/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Because the proceedings held on August 29, 2001, and October 1, 2001, occurred after the docketing of this appeal, the request for transcripts of these proceedings was improper. Ms. Nelson is not obliged to produce these transcripts. Ms. Nelson shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the remaining requested transcripts conducted on June 27, 2001 and July 18, 2001or file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, Ms. Nelson shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 02-17937
12/02/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 30, 2002. 02-20514
12/03/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, Ms. Nelson has still not filed the requested transcripts nor communcated with this court concerning this matter. Ms. Nelson shall 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcripts of show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. 02-20644
12/16/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 27, 2001 and July 18, 2001. 02-21469
01/16/2003MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 03-00922
01/27/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 03-01390
01/27/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.