judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. E. PINKSTON, ET AL. v. SUSA DALE PINKSTON

Case: A-4674
A-4674
05/04/1954
Application for Writ of Error
W. E. PINKSTON, ET AL.
SUSA DALE PINKSTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/02/1954Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/16/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/22/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/04/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/09/1954Response to Motion filed
07/02/1954Supplement to Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/16/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/22/1954Brief on the Merits
05/04/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Susa Dale PinkstonRespondent
W. E. Pinkston, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information