judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-82-00270-CR
14-82-00270-CR
01/22/1982
Robbery
Johnson, Lawrence Edward
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/23/1984Mandate Issued
01/23/1984Record RETURNED from Higher Court
01/06/1984Petition for Discretionary ReviewDENIED
08/22/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
08/05/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/23/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/17/1983Submitted
02/14/1983Case ready to be set
10/29/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
06/29/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
04/23/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
01/22/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
149th District Court
Brazoria
13,660
life (2 cts.)