judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-00337-CR
05-82-00337-CR
01/21/1982
Burglary
Nikrasch, Terrance Edward
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/19/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/17/1983Reply brief filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/03/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
11/27/1985Mandate Issued
09/27/1985Opinion issuedDismissed
09/27/1985Opinion issuedDismissed
09/06/1985Submitted
09/05/1985Supplemental Brief Filed
07/08/1985Brief Filed
05/06/1985MattConv
04/29/1985Case Returned from Higher Ct.
04/18/1985Mandate IssuedReversed & Remanded to Ct. App
04/17/1985Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals
03/27/1985Opinion issued
10/19/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/17/1983Reply brief filed
06/23/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
06/20/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/19/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/11/1983Submitted
04/07/1983Submission
01/28/1983Brief Filed
09/29/1982Brief Filed
09/14/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/16/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/14/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/17/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
01/21/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/27/1985Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nikrasch, Terrance EdwardCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Ed Kinkeade
F81-12444-M
10 Years TDC