judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-82-00007-CR
10-82-00007-CR
01/25/1982
Burglary of Vehicles
James Charles Manuel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/03/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/08/1983Case stored
06/08/1983Mandate issued by this Court
04/07/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/17/1983Submitted
01/25/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
11,772
5 Years