judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-00097-CV
05-82-00097-CV
01/22/1982
Miscellaneous civil
American Bank & Trust, et al
Dallas County, et al
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/26/2018Order enteredDestroy
08/13/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
06/13/2018Letter issued by the court
08/03/1984MattConvDismissed
04/02/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/26/1982Response to Motion
03/16/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/01/1982Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Granted
01/22/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
01/22/1982MattConv
01/22/1982MattConvMotion or Writ Granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/26/2018Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
134th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Jimmie Thompson
80-3206-G