judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-82-00017-CR
08-82-00017-CR
01/22/1982
Other Drug Possession
Harrelson, Charles V.
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/1987Shuck purged
10/17/1984Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
10/17/1984Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Granted
05/21/1984No description available.
05/04/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/25/1984No description available.
04/23/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/12/1984Petition for Discretionary Review
04/04/1984No description available.
04/04/1984No description available.
03/14/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/17/1984Submitted
01/13/1984Submission
11/28/1983Brief Filed
11/28/1983Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
11/09/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/19/1983Brief Filed
10/19/1983Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
10/19/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/14/1983Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/14/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/02/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/02/1983No description available.
08/30/1983Record filed.
01/22/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/17/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
205th District Court
Culberson
Honorable Sam W. Callan
511
40 Years