judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5742
B-5742
01/09/1976
Application for Writ of Error
MAX H. FAYKUS, M.D. AND WALTER HERBST, M.D.
DOROTHY GRADY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/31/1976Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/16/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/11/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/26/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
01/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/31/1976Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
03/24/1976Response to Motion filed
03/16/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/11/1976Reply to Response
01/26/1976Response to Petition
01/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/09/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Max H. Faykus, M.D. and Walter Herbst, M.D.Petitioner
Dorothy GradyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information