judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RASKI (WAYLON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32439
Short Caption:RASKI (WAYLON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141063Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/14/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/01/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (fast track notice mailed to counsel for appellant.)
06/01/1998MotionFiled Motion. For Exemption from NRAP 3C-Fast Track Program (Received in this office on 5/28/98).
06/15/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting Telephonic Extension. Pursuant to the telephonic request of June 15, 1998, court reporter Kit McDonald shall have to and including June 22, 1998, to serve and file the rough draft transcripts requested herein.
06/23/1998Other Other. Filed Court Reporter's Affidavit in Support of request for Continuance for Preparation of Transcript(s).
06/26/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On June 23, 1998, the court reporter filed a motion for an extension of time to file the rough draft transcripts. The motion is granted. The transcripts shall be filed no later than June 26, 1998.
06/29/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. 02/27/98; 02/25/98; 02/24/98; 02/23/98; 02/20/98; 02/18/98; 02/17/98; 02/12/98; 02/10/98; 02/09/98; and 05/05/98.
07/01/1998MotionFiled Motion. For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Motion for Exemption from NRAP 3C (fast track program).
07/07/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On June 1, 1998, appellant filed a motion for exemption from NRAP 3C. Counsel further represents that due to the severity of the charges below, the court reporters were not notified that a rough draft transcript could be required pursuant to NRAP 3C(d)(2). Fn1[Nonetheless, transcripts of the proceedings below were filed in this court on June 29, 1998.] The provisions of NRAP 3C are not optional, and accordingly, appellant's motion must be denied. Appellant's counsel shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. If further extensions are required, application may be made pursuant to NRAP 3C(h), and upon showing of extreme need or merit, they will be granted.
07/29/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified copy of Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Cynthia K. Durivage.
08/03/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Jonell Thomas to Freelance Court Reporters re: transcripts of 2/11/98 and 2/19/98.
08/05/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified copy of Transcript of Proceedings: 2/11/98 and 2/19/98. Court Reporter: Diann Prock.
08/14/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Copy of Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald.
08/17/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.
08/17/1998MotionFiled Motion. To file Appendix consisting of 264 pages.
08/17/1998AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2.
08/19/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting appellant's motion for leave to file an appendix in excess of 250 pages. The clerk shall forthwith file the 264-page appendix submitted provisionally with appellant's motion.
08/19/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix. Vols. I and II.
09/03/1998MotionFiled Motion. For Leave to file 13 page Fast Track Response.
09/03/1998Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Response.
09/21/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Respondent has filed a motion for leave to file a 13 page fast track response. We grant respondent's motion. We direct the clerk to file the fast track response, submitted provisionally with respondent's motion on September 3, 1998.
09/21/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.
11/05/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. The appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 40 days after the date of this order. Fn2[We note that certified copies of the transcripts of the proceedings have already been filed with this court. Counsel will not be required purduant to NRAP 9 to file additional certified transcripts.] The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31.
12/17/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 12/14/98).
01/14/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark).
02/18/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 2/16/99).
10/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
10/14/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the briefs this day to the Southern Nevada Panel.
10/14/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/27/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." - SNP99B/WM/MS/NB. 00-06843
05/16/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (LV Dropbox--5/15/00) 00-08151
05/29/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Change of Address for JoNell Thomas (updated in CMS).
08/11/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14038
08/29/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14103
08/29/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14103