judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BELINDA DOVER v. JAMES AND DEBRA WALKER

Case Heading (S-11-0057)
Case Number:S-11-0057Case Docketed On:03/03/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:BELINDA DOVER v. JAMES AND DEBRA WALKER
Full Title:BELINDA DOVER, Appellant (Defendant), v. JAMES AND DEBRA WALKER, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBelinda DoverJohn Craig Abraham
AppelleeJames WalkerMatthew David Winslow
AppelleeDebra WalkerMatthew David Winslow

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/03/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/03/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/14/2011Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
03/30/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/29/2011Event - Phone Call - from Appellant re appeal, advised case was dismissed lack of jurisdiction and is now closed.EventPhone CallFinal
06/10/2011Event - Phone Call from Appellant re dismissal. sent her a copy of the order.EventPhone CallFinal