judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOANNES MONGARDINI V. KRISTINA M. HALLMAN

Case Information: 11-FM-0014
Short Caption:JOANNES MONGARDINI V. KRISTINA M. HALLMANClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB755-09Filed Date:01/11/2011

Opening Event Date:01/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/11/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/03/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/14/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoannes MongardiniNPro SeN
AppelleeKristina M. HallmanNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY and review of the trial court's order amending and clarifying parts of the . . . Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment of Absolute Divorce, Custody, Support, Alimony and Equitable Distribution of Property
01/12/2011TMC - appellant's motion for stay - oppo
01/19/2011LETTER - aple will be representing herself.
01/19/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion for stay and review (filed by appellee pro se)
01/21/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY TRIAL COURT ORDER IS DENIED as he failed to file for a stay in Superior Court and to address the relevant sandard for a stay. See Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987). It is ****MORE*****
01/21/2011 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal... FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (RZFITE) (rm)
01/24/2011LETTER - from attorney Weisberg stating she will not be representing aple on the appeal
02/04/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (No Rt needed)
02/17/2011RECORD INDEX
02/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
03/21/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to motion to dismiss
04/08/2011ORDER DENY APLE MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL It is F/O that appellant shall comply with Rule 30(a) & (b) within 15 days from the date of this order with a copy to this court. It is F/O that appellant file the brief and appendix within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW)
04/14/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 40 days 7/13/11
04/22/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE - aplt's appendix and enforce production of statement of issues that aplt intends to present for review *******CONSTRUED AS MOTION TO STRIE BRIEF SEE 5/11/11 ORDER LW
04/22/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for extension of time to file brief
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion to strike aplt's appendix and to enforce production of statement of issues that aplt intends to present for review
04/28/2011APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to aplt's oppo to motion for extension of time
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF *******STRICKEN PER 5/11/11 ORDER LW
05/04/2011TMC - appellee's motion to strike appellant's appendix - oppo - appellee's motion to extend briefing - oppo - response
05/11/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED and APPELLANT'S BRIEF IS STRICKEN and appellant shall w/n 20 days file a brief that meets the requirements of DC App. R. 28 and a joint appendix...SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S BRIEF shall be filed w/n 30 days after the date appellant files his conforming brief and joint appendix. It is ****MORE*****
05/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF IS DENIED AS MOOT. (RZTHPR)
05/27/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF-****STRUCK PER 6/23/11 ORDER LW
05/27/2011APPENDIX - *****STRUCK PER 6/23/11 ORDER LW
06/02/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE - aplt's brief and appendix
06/06/2011TMC - motion to strike appellant's brief - oppo
06/08/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to motion to strike aplt's appdx and brief and to move for dismissal.
06/23/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED and appellant's brief and appendix are STRICKEN and APPELANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS FILE A BRIEF that meets the requirements of DC App. R. 28 and JOINT APPENDIX...SEE HARDCOPY APPELLEE'S BRIEF shall be due 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. It is ***MORE***
06/23/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS IS DENIED W/O PREJUDICE to renewal if appellant fails to file a conforming brief and joint appendix. (RZTHPR)
07/01/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
07/01/2011APPENDIX
07/07/2011FiledAPPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE - aplt's appendix and brief AND to dismiss appeal
07/13/2011FiledTMC-APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE & TO DISMISS-motion to file (LODGED) oppo
08/05/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File oppo to motion to strike & dismiss appeal (Appellant)Granted
09/09/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave/DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS
09/09/2011FiledOpposition to motion to strike and dismiss appeal (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/11/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/18/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/03/2012FiledSubmitted To Farrell,Washington,Glickman
04/20/2012FiledAffirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
05/14/2012FiledMandate