judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ASUIT (ANDREW) VS. STATE C/W 36127

Case Information: 34930
Short Caption:ASUIT (ANDREW) VS. STATE C/W 36127Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34930*, 36127
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980044Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/08/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09564
11/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34930, 35036. 99-11332
12/08/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 12/07/99. 99-12315
12/08/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Having conducted a preliminary review of the record, we conclude that our review of additional documents is warranted. Accordingly, the clerk of the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to transmit to the clerk of this court, as a supplemental record on appeal, a certified copy of the transcript of the proceedings in district court on March 12, 1998. In the event that the necessary transcripts have not previously been prepared and filed in the district court, the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to order the prompt preparation of the transcripts. If such an order is required, the clerk of the district court shall deliver a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court within 15 days. Upon completion of the transcripts, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days within which to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of each of the transcripts as a supplemental record on appeal. Additionally, we have determined that a copy of any written guilty plea memorandum would also assist this court in the resolution of this appeal. The clerk of the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to transmit to the clerk of this court a file-stamped copy of the written guilty plea memorandum as a supplemental record on appeal or to inform this court that no such memorandum was filed in the district court. 01-09847
06/20/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Ruth Morgan, Deputy Clerk stating that the transcript of March 12, 1998 has not been transcribed. Department Nine is in the process of ordering it transcribed, and it will be transmitted as soon as it is filed by the reporter. There has not been a guilty plea memorandum filed into this case. 01-10393
06/25/2001Other Other. Received copy of District Court Order directing Court Reporter Marion Brown-Pava to prepare the March 12, 1998 transcript. Filed in the district court on June 21, 2001. 01-10675
06/28/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 12, 1998. Court Reporter: Marian S. Brown Pava. (Transcript in response to this Court's order filed 6/13/01). 01-10983
07/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR. Nos. 34930/36127. 01-12176
08/14/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-12333
08/14/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/21/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 15, 2001. 01-12333