judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER CHARLES FREEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0056)
Case Number:S-11-0056Case Docketed On:03/02/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER CHARLES FREEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER CHARLES FREEMAN, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerChristopher Charles FreemanDiane Elizabeth Courselle
Joleen J. Missoni
RespondentThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Gregory A. Phillips
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/02/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/02/2011Petition - Writ - review (attachments not scanned - unredacted)PetitionWrit - reviewFinal
03/02/2011Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
03/22/2011Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
05/03/2011Event - Rejected Filing - brief of petitioner because counsel commented that it had the wrong case number on it. Will resubmit.EventRejected FilingFinal
05/05/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client - Joleen J. Missoni, Student Director, DAP, for appellant.Notice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
05/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant (original signature of Joleen Mossoni)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant (original signature of Diane Courselle)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for Joleen Mossoni to appear on behalf of Appellant (Copy, original apparently filed in District Court)Notice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
05/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/10/2011Event - Other - E-filing service system error - service notification not sent by e-mail until 5/10/2011. Adjusted tickler date to reflect actual date of service by system.EventOtherFinal
06/21/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/22/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Respondent Recognizing ErrorEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/11/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/12/2011Opinion - Published order Reversing Order Denying Credit for Time ServedOpinionPublished orderFinal
07/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Other - Mandate Cover Letter, no record to be returned.Notice-OutgoingOtherFinal
08/26/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal