judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY D. BARBER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1634
Short Caption:ANTHONY D. BARBER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL963-04Filed Date:12/20/2010

Opening Event Date:12/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/25/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony D. Barber YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/14/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS FROM the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. (BY: ETW)
01/14/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
01/28/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
02/03/2011 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App R. 4(b)(1). (BRTEFA) (rm)
02/03/2011DISMISSED
02/25/2011MANDATE ISSUED