judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

BURTON CONSTRUCTION AND SHIPBUILDING COMPANY, INC. v. ORALEE BROUSSARD

Case: A-4676
A-4676
05/10/1954
Application for Writ of Error
BURTON CONSTRUCTION AND SHIPBUILDING COMPANY, INC.
ORALEE BROUSSARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/23/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/20/1954Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/10/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/23/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/08/1954Opinion issued
10/20/1954Supplemental Brief filed
06/23/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/23/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/23/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/23/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1954Response to Motion filed
05/21/1954Motion to dismiss
05/10/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/10/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Oralee BroussardRespondent
Burton Construction and Shipbuilding Company, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information