judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00756-CR
14-89-00756-CR
08/15/1989
Other Felony
Riley, Spencer
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/21/1989Case stored
09/21/1989Mandate Issued
09/21/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
09/21/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
09/21/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
09/21/1989Mandate Issued
09/20/1989Submitted
09/20/1989Submission
09/20/1989Submitted
09/14/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
08/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/11/1989Date of Sentence
08/11/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/21/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantJohn V. Tarleton
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
Honorable ROBERT MONTGOMERY
525,757
5 years TDC