judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00758-CR
14-89-00758-CR
08/15/1989
Unauth. Use of Motor Vehical
Birks, Richard Orlando
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/12/1990Case stored
08/14/1990Mandate Issued
08/14/1990Mandate Issued
07/30/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
07/13/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/27/1990Submitted
06/27/1990Submission
06/27/1990Submitted
06/06/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/06/1990Case ready to be set
06/06/1990Case ready to be set
05/17/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STADENIED
05/17/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/17/1990Motion to Obtain Record DISPOSED - APP, PRO SEDENIED
05/17/1990Motion to substitute attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APEDENIED
05/11/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/11/1990Motion to Obtain Record FILED - APP, PRO SE
05/11/1990Motion to substitute attorney FILED-ANT,APE
05/09/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/11/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/22/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/12/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/22/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/12/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/11/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
12/27/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
12/13/1989No description available.
12/08/1989Transcript FILED
11/24/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/14/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
08/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/14/1989Motion for new trial FILED
08/10/1989Date of Sentence
08/10/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/12/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasRoger A. Haseman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. Pamela P. Shaffer
Trial Court Information
180th District Court
Harris
515,021
33 years TDC