judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

RESERVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. WILLIAM C. KELLY, ET UX.

Case: A-4680
A-4680
05/12/1954
Application for Writ of Error
RESERVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
WILLIAM C. KELLY, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
06/16/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/29/1954Supplement to ResponseRespondent
05/25/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/21/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
05/12/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
06/23/1954Response to Motion filed
06/16/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/29/1954Supplement to Response
05/25/1954Reply to Response
05/21/1954Response to Petition
05/12/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/12/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William C. Kelly, et ux.Respondent
Reserve Life Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information