judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TERRYBERRY VS. FEDDERS

Case Information: 34924
Short Caption:TERRYBERRY VS. FEDDERSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33423 , 33442 , 34984 , 36773
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D135368Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (SEALED). Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09531
10/05/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Proper person Amended Motion for Leave, Notice of Appeal. 99-10042
12/06/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper perosn, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML. 99-12145
01/13/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Petitioner requested an extension of time to submit a petition for rehearing. We grant this request. Although petitioner was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from petitioner]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00555
01/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01505
01/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 22, 2000. 00-01505