judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRETT COTE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0008
Short Caption:BRETT COTE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD16265-10Filed Date:01/05/2011

Opening Event Date:01/05/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/21/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBrett Cote Y
William T. MorrisonNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/05/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/14/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that William Morrison, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/14/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) William Morrison ,Esquire
02/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (74pgs/Tape) 11/8/10 proc.
02/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (34pgs/Tape) 11/10/10 proc.
02/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/10/2011RECORD COPIES
02/10/2011RECORD INDEX
02/23/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 14, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so.(Castillo)
03/21/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 23, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to submit the statement regarding transcript within 15 days, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the document has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time w/in which to do so. (ETW)
04/05/2011RECEIVED - aplts' motion for leave to file statement transcripts and statement regarding trancript (sent back for signature on statement)
04/13/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
04/13/2011RECEIVED- aplt's statement regarding transcripts
05/03/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is fled. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
05/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
06/17/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 60 days
07/06/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 12, 2011. (By: JAC)
08/04/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw Under Anders & Brief combined (Appellant)Held in Abeyance
08/11/2011FiledOrder that APPELLANT SHALL FILE ANDERS RESPONSE BY 9/6/11
08/11/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
09/06/2011FiledAffidavit - from appellant's counsel re: service of Anders (Appellant)
10/26/2011FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw Under Anders
10/26/2011FiledAffirmed
11/21/2011FiledMandate