judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVE EDWARD DOBBINS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0050)
Parent:S-11-0050Case Docketed On:02/28/2011
Consolidated: S-11-0253
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:STEVE EDWARD DOBBINS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVE EDWARD DOBBINS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteve Edward DobbinsDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingD. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Gregory A. Phillips
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2012 WY 110
Citation:298 P.3d 807

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/13/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/15/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/25/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/25/2011Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
05/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants motion to stay briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for second extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/07/2011Order - Granting stayOrderGranting stayFinal
07/08/2011Event - Phone Call re status of remand, hearing date vacated and resetEventPhone CallFinal
08/12/2011System - Status check - other. Received call from Ms. Olson indicating that the motion has been denied, no order yet entered, but should be available next week, and it will be sent to this court.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
08/17/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order on remand, "Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Withdraw No Contest Plea"Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder on remandFinal
10/27/2011Event - Other - resume briefing schedule with docketing of second notice of appealEventOtherFinal
11/01/2011Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
11/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Consolidate CasesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2011Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
12/13/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/06/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/17/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/27/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/10/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/28/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/28/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/28/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/28/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/31/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/30/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal