judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-19,786-04
WR-19,786-04
07/28/1989
1107-HC
TIBBS, JAMES ISHMAEL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/28/1993RESPONSE RECEIVEDApplication for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 11.07
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/07/1994MISC DOCUMENT RECD
05/28/1993RESPONSE RECEIVED
05/17/1993MISC DOCUMENT RECD
09/13/1989ACTION TAKENHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
07/28/1989WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/13/1989STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TIBBS, JAMES ISHMAELApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
50766-D