judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REBER (RALPH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34923
Short Caption:REBER (RALPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33768
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C148169Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/22/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09529
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34922, 34923, 34928, 34942, 34949, 34990, 35002, 35006. 99-11148
02/22/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 02/16/00. 00-02747
02/22/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-11404
07/31/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11595
07/31/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. 01-11595