judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RALPH E. PLATT individually, and RALPH E. PLATT AND RONALD R. PLATT Co-Trustees of the Ralph E. Platt Ranch Revocable Trust, dated the 11th day of May, 2006 v. WAYNE W. PLATT, individually; WAYNE W. PLATT as trustee of the PLATT RANCH TRUST dated October 10, 1991; WAYNE W. PLATT AND GEORGIA PLATT as trustees of the Wayne W. Platt and Georgia Platt Revocable Trust dated the 13th day of February, 2007; and ALICE A. PLATT, formerly Alice A. Creighton

Case Heading (S-11-0049)
Case Number:S-11-0049Case Docketed On:02/28/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:RALPH E. PLATT individually, and RALPH E. PLATT AND RONALD R. PLATT Co-Trustees of the Ralph E. Platt Ranch Revocable Trust, dated the 11th day of May, 2006 v. WAYNE W. PLATT, individually; WAYNE W. PLATT as trustee of the PLATT RANCH TRUST dated October 10, 1991; WAYNE W. PLATT AND GEORGIA PLATT as trustees of the Wayne W. Platt and Georgia Platt Revocable Trust dated the 13th day of February, 2007; and ALICE A. PLATT, formerly Alice A. Creighton
Full Title:RALPH E. PLATT individually, and RALPH E. PLATT AND RONALD R. PLATT Co-Trustees of the Ralph E. Platt Ranch Revocable Trust, dated the 11th day of May, 2006, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. WAYNE W. PLATT, individually; WAYNE W. PLATT as trustee of the PLATT RANCH TRUST dated October 10, 1991; WAYNE W. PLATT AND GEORGIA PLATT as trustees of the Wayne W. Platt and Georgia Platt Revocable Trust dated the 13th day of February, 2007; and ALICE A. PLATT, formerly Alice A. Creighton, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRalph E. PlattWilliam L. Hiser
Elisa Michelle Butler
AppellantRalph E. Platt Ranch Revocable TrustWilliam L. Hiser
Elisa Michelle Butler
AppelleeWayne W. PlattBrandon Lee Jensen
Karen Budd Falen
AppelleePlatt Ranch TrustBrandon Lee Jensen
Karen Budd Falen
AppelleeAlice A. PlattBrandon Lee Jensen
Karen Budd Falen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real
Opinion Number:2011 WY 155
Citation:264 P.3d 804

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/28/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/18/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Amended)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/09/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/10/2011Event - Other - E-filing service system error - service notification not sent by e-mail until 5/10/2011. Adjusted tickler date to reflect actual date of service by system.EventOtherFinal
05/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Wayne W. and Alice Platt and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellees, they represent all on appealEventPhone CallFinal
05/26/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellants.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/07/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/01/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William L. Hiser and Elisa M. Butler for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Brandon L. Jensen for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William L. Hiser for appellants; Brandon Lee Jensen for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/16/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/10/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/29/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/29/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/02/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/1/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal