judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN ANTHONY BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0007
Short Caption:KEVIN ANTHONY BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-17331-08Filed Date:01/05/2011

Opening Event Date:01/05/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/02/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/30/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/14/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin Anthony Brown YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Katherine M. KellyYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/05/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/16/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (12 pgs/tape) 7/29/08 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (62 pgs/tape) 8/1/08 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (6 pgs/Richer) 10/21/08 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (9 pgs/Richer) 12/19/08 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (8 pgs/Davis) 1/30/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (7 pgs/tape) 2/24/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (6 pgs/tape) 3/19/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (6 pgs/tape) 4/29/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (7 pgs/Gilliam) 6/3/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (6 pgs/Rogers) 9/30/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (18 pgs/Rogers) 10/8/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (18 pgs/McCarn) 10/26/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (18 pgs/McCarn) 10/27/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (18 pgs/Hunt) 5/10/10 proc. a.m.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (142 pgs/Maar) 5/10/10 proc. a.m.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (165 pgs/Maddox) 5/11/10 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (166-366 pgs/Maddox) 5/12/10 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #18 (212 pgs/Jeon) 5/13/10 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #19 (241 pgs/Rogers) 5/18/10 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #20 (68 pgs/Walker) 5/19/10 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #21 (8 pgs/Walker) 5/20/10 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #22 (14 pgs/tape) 8/6/10 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #23 (27 pgs/tape) 12/17/10 proc. w/cd
04/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/14/2011RECORD INDEX
04/14/2011RECORD COPIES
04/14/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #24 (SEALED sup crt orders)
05/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
05/31/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 22, 2011. (JAC)
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief 90 Days (Appellant)
08/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 11/21/11.
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/06/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file brief and the limited appendix to 2/21/12.
02/06/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #25 (100 pgs/McCarn) 5/10/10 proc. w/cd
02/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 5/14/12
05/14/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
05/14/2012FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
06/12/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
06/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 8/2/12.
08/02/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/02/2012FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellee)
08/02/2012FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
08/20/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/31/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
10/26/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/07/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (appellant)Granted
12/12/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
12/12/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/30/2013FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Farrell, Shilpa S. Satoskar, Esq. for appellant Katherine M. Kelly, Esq. for appellee
03/18/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
03/29/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition fro rehearing or rehearing en banc Other (Appellant)Granted
04/03/2013FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 5/1/13.
06/07/2013FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
06/14/2013FiledMandate
10/25/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)