judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1096-89
PD-1096-89
07/28/1989
PDR Case Type
YOUNG, GARY ALLAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/06/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/29/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/28/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
YOUNG, GARY ALLANApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Kevin J. Clancy
Frank S. Wright
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01204-CR
Aff 6-21-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No 8
Dallas
Honorable John C. Hendrik
MB87-47358-J