judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1092-89
PD-1092-89
07/28/1989
PDR Case Type
WILLIAMS, RONNIE JOE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/19/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/28/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WILLIAMS, RONNIE JOEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Lawrence B. Mitchell
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00725-CR
Aff 6-19-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 5 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable PAT MCDOWELL
F88-93266-JL