Case Information: 70737 | |||
Short Caption: | EDY VS. MCMANUS AUCTIONS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 70737-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A703290 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 07/14/2016 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/07/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | ||
07/07/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 16-21127 | |
07/07/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | 16-21131 | |
07/13/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Canon Law Services. Check No. 2071. | ||
07/13/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | 16-21825 | |
07/14/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 16-22007 | |
08/02/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | 16-23897 | |
08/11/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference has been scheduled for Wednesday, Aug. 24, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. Please note the time change from 1:00 p.m. to 10:30 a.m. | 16-24887 | |
08/29/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 16-26858 | |
09/02/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | 16-27388 | |
09/16/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/07/16, 03/08/16. To Court Reporter: Angie Calvillo. | 16-28808 | |
11/04/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (First Request). | 16-34421 | |
11/14/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 17, 2017. | 16-35377 | |
01/18/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | 17-01787 | |
01/18/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume I. | 17-01788 | |
01/18/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume II. | 17-01789 | |
02/22/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel. Attorney Theresa Mains appearing as counsel for respondent. | 17-06080 | |
02/22/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief (first request). | 17-06081 | |
02/22/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Answering Brief due: March 6, 2017. | 17-06084 | |
03/07/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time of 5 Days to File Respondent's Answering Brief (second request). | 17-07633 | |
03/14/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time of 1 Day to File Respondent's Answering Brief (third request). | 17-08473 | |
03/17/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The clerk shall file the answering brief and appendix received on March 14, 2017. Reply Brief due: 30 days. | 17-08993 | |
03/17/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondents Answering Brief. | 17-08994 | |
03/17/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Respondent McManus Auctions Appendix Vol I. | 17-08995 | |
05/05/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. | ||
07/12/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals. | 17-23158 | |
10/31/2017 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." GIBBONS, J., concurring. Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG. | ||
11/27/2017 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. | ||
11/27/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 17-40583 | |
11/27/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/15/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 5, 2017. | 17-40583 |