judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8915
C-8915
08/01/1989
Second App Writ Error
McALLEN METHODIST HOSPITAL AND UNITED BLOOD SERVICES
JUAN LONGORIA ET UX. INDIVIDUALLY AND a/n/f OF SAN JUANITA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/05/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/03/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)OF SCOTT & WHITE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ATTY-JAMIE H. CLEMENTS, 2401 SOUTH 31ST STREET, TEMPLE, TEXAS 76508
03/28/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)OF TX MEDICAL ASSOC., ATTY-DONALD P. WILCOX, 1801 N. LAMAR BLVD., AUSTIN, TEXAS 78701
03/15/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)BEHALF OF TX HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ATTY-CHARLES W BAILEY & MATTHEW T WALL, P. O. BOX 15587, AUSTIN, TEXAS 78761
03/15/1990Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/15/1990Motion for RehearingPetitionerBEHALF OF UNITED BLOOD SERVICES.
03/14/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)BEHALF OF AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF BLOGOD BANKS, ET AL.
11/15/1989Brief on the MeritsRespondent2ND MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN REPLY
11/06/1989Reply BriefPetitionerOF UNITED BLOOD TO RSP LETTER OF 10- 27, 1989
10/23/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)J. K. & SUSIE L. WADLEY RESEARCH INSTITUTE & BLOOD BANK, ATTY BILLY BALLENGEE-COWLES & THOMPSON, DALLAS, TEXAS
10/20/1989Brief on the MeritsRespondentRESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM BRIEF
09/07/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentON BEHALF OF MCALLEN METHODIST HOSP.
08/17/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentREPLY TO APP.#1: MCALLEN METHODIST
08/17/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentREPLY TO APP.#2: UNITED BLOOD SER.
08/01/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#2: UNITED BLOOD SERVICES
08/01/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#1: MCALLEN METHODIST HOSP.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/05/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/18/1990list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksANT'S COA BRIEF
05/18/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
05/16/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled#2 - UNITED BLOOD SERVICES
05/16/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled#1 - MCALLEN METHODIST HOSP.
04/03/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedOF SCOTT & WHITE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ATTY-JAMIE H. CLEMENTS, 2401 SOUTH 31ST STREET, TEMPLE, TEXAS 76508
03/28/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedOF TX MEDICAL ASSOC., ATTY-DONALD P. WILCOX, 1801 N. LAMAR BLVD., AUSTIN, TEXAS 78701
03/22/1990Motion for Rehearing forwarded
03/15/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedBEHALF OF TX HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ATTY-CHARLES W BAILEY & MATTHEW T WALL, P. O. BOX 15587, AUSTIN, TEXAS 78761
03/15/1990Motion for RehearingBEHALF OF UNITED BLOOD SERVICES.
03/15/1990Motion for Rehearing
03/14/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedBEHALF OF AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF BLOGOD BANKS, ET AL.
02/28/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied#2 - UNITED BLOOD SERVICES
02/28/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied#1 - MCALLEN METHODIST HOSPITAL
02/28/1990Previous Order of the Court withdrawnOrder withdrawn; petition improvidently granted.ORDER OF OCT. 4, 1989 GRANTING APP ON BEHALF OF UNITED BLOOD SERVICES IS W/D AS APP WAS IMPROVIDENTLY GRANTED.
02/28/1990Previous Order of the Court withdrawnOrder withdrawn; petition improvidently granted.ORDER OF OCT. 4, 1989 GRANTING APP ON BEHALF OF MCALLEN METHODIST HOSP IS WITHDRAWN AS APP WAS IMPROVIDENT GRANT.
11/15/1989Brief on the Merits2ND MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN REPLY
11/14/1989Petitioner's reply briefOF MCALLEN METHODIST HOSPITAL TO LTR DATED 10-27-89
11/06/1989Reply BriefOF UNITED BLOOD TO RSP LETTER OF 10- 27, 1989
11/01/1989Additional cites or additional authorities
10/25/1989Oral argument ARGUED FOR PET BY LEE C. SALZMAN, ROGER W. HUGHES & ROGER TOWNSEND ARGUED FOR RESP BY RICHARD C. ARROYO
10/23/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedJ. K. & SUSIE L. WADLEY RESEARCH INSTITUTE & BLOOD BANK, ATTY BILLY BALLENGEE-COWLES & THOMPSON, DALLAS, TEXAS
10/23/1989Appendix to any instrumentAPPENDIX TO AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF
10/20/1989Additional cites or additional authorities
10/20/1989Brief on the MeritsRESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM BRIEF
10/09/1989Additional cites or additional authorities
10/04/1989Amount of time allotted for oral argument.20/20-10 MINUTES.
10/04/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedAPP#2 - UNITED BLOOD SVC - PT. #1. (THIS ORDER WITHDRAWN ON 2-28-90, AS APP WAS IMPROVIDENTLY GRANTED.)
10/04/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedAPP#1 - MCALLEN HOSP. - POINT #6. (THIS ORDER WITHDRAWN ON FEB. 28, 1990, AS APP WAS IMPROVIDENTLY GRANTED.)
10/04/1989Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
09/07/1989Reply to ResponseON BEHALF OF MCALLEN METHODIST HOSP.
08/31/1989Letter FiledINDEX TO EXHIBITS OF REPLY FILED 08- 17-89
08/31/1989Letter FiledINDEX TO EXHIBITS OF REPLY FILED 08- 17-89
08/29/1989Petitioner's reply briefUNITED BLOOD SERVICES' REPLY
08/23/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/23/1989No description available.
08/17/1989Reply to ResponseREPLY TO APP.#1: MCALLEN METHODIST
08/17/1989Reply to ResponseREPLY TO APP.#2: UNITED BLOOD SER.
08/11/1989Additional cites or additional authorities
08/01/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#2: UNITED BLOOD SERVICES
08/01/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#1: MCALLEN METHODIST HOSP.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/18/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00094-CV
Reversed and Remanded
771 SW2d 663, 05-18-89
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable ROBERT J. SEERDEN
Trial Court Information
93rd District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable John F. Dominguez
C-2426-86-B