judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUEBNER VS. STATE

Case Information: 34919
Short Caption:HUEBNER VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C133342Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/09/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09516
10/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-11128
12/09/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 12/06/99. 99-12372
12/09/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/20/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn3[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the rlief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B/RR/WM/MS 00-10558
07/26/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP99B-RR/WM/MS 00-12988
08/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13010
08/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13010