judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDREW NICELY V. DC DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 11-AA-0002
Short Caption:ANDREW NICELY V. DC DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DPW044619-10Filed Date:01/07/2011

Opening Event Date:01/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/28/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/14/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAndrew Nicely NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY
Richard S. LoveNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/07/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
01/07/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
01/07/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
01/13/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
04/07/2011LETTER, from the Office of Administrative Hearings, regarding production of the Administrative Record & Transcript and related costs & fees to Petitioner.
04/28/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
04/28/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/10/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
06/06/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
06/06/2011APPENDIX
07/01/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days AND motion for an order requiring the filing of the hearing transcript by the Office of Administrative Hearing
08/08/2011FiledOrder Granting RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF AND motion for an order requiring the filing of the hearing transcript by the Office of Administrative Hearing.
09/27/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Respondent)Granted
09/28/2011FiledOpposition to Motion to dismiss (Petitioner)
09/28/2011FiledReply to petitioner's resonse in oppo to its motion for an order vacating the final order of the ofc of adminstrative hearing and dismission the appeal as moot (Respondent)
10/07/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File to File A Short Surreply or for Oral Argument Regarding Respondent's Motion to Dismiss on Mootness Grounds. (Petitioner)Granted
10/13/2011FiledAnswer/Response to pet's motion for leave to file sur-reply (Respondent)
10/14/2011FiledOrder Granting petitioner's motion For Leave to file Surreply
10/14/2011FiledOrder Granting respondent's motion to dismiss and to remand the case to the agency to dismiss the issue.
10/14/2011FiledDismissed and Remanded
10/14/2011FiledMandate
10/25/2011FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Petitioner)
10/27/2011FiledTMC/PETITIONER'S BILL OF COSTS/response
11/01/2011FiledAnswer/Response - to petitioner's motion for bill of costs (Respondent)
11/09/2011FiledReply - to Respondent's ojections to the bill of costs (Petitioner)
11/15/2011FiledORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR COSTS...