judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

EVERETT C. STONE v. TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION

Case: A-4690
A-4690
05/14/1954
Application for Writ of Error
EVERETT C. STONE
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/24/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/24/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
05/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/24/1954Response to Motion filed
11/24/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/23/1954Motion to Argue filed
11/10/1954Concurring Opinion issued.
11/10/1954Opinion issued
06/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/24/1954Response to Petition
05/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationRespondent
Everett C. StonePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information