judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00303-CR
13-89-00303-CR
08/01/1989
Indecency with a child
Dickerson, John
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/28/1991Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/12/1991Certificate Filed
03/06/1991Motion to Withdraw ____________ Filed
10/31/1989Mandate Issued
10/17/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
10/02/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/14/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/14/1989Motion for leave to file NOA DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Denied
09/14/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
09/11/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
08/25/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/22/1989Due date for record to be filed
08/22/1989Motion for leave to file notice of appeal received
08/14/1989Green card in
08/11/198910 day letter sent
08/01/1989Transcript Received
08/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
347th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Joaquin Villarreal
89-CR-27-H
20 yrs tdc