judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8906
C-8906
08/01/1989
App Writ of Error
KIRBY FOREST INDUSTRIES INC.
JACKIE GLYNN KIRKLAND
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/15/1989Motion for RehearingPetitionerRULE #5 ENVELOPE ATTACHED
12/15/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
11/29/1989Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefRespondent
11/17/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)OF TEXAS FORESTRY ASSOC., ATTY.- ROBERT T. CAIN, JR., P. O. DRAWER 1728, LUFKIN, TX 75901
09/15/1989Reply BriefRespondentRESPONDENT JACKIE GLYNN KIRKLAND'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PET'S OBJECTIONS TO MO TO STRIKE RESPONDENT'S BRIE
08/14/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/01/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/18/1990Case StoredREHEARING WITHDRAWN
01/18/1990list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksONLY ORIGINALS OF ALL BRIEFS ON REHEARING AVAILABLE WHEN RECORD WAS SEPARATED FOR RETURN
01/17/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedWithdrawn
01/17/1990Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling grantedPET'S MO/WITHDRAW MO/RE
12/27/1989Motion to withdraw motion for rehearing
12/21/1989Motion for Rehearing forwardedBOXED RECORD IN CLERK`S OFFICE
12/15/1989Motion for RehearingRULE #5 ENVELOPE ATTACHED
12/15/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
11/29/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedPET'S MO TO STRIKE RESP'S BR OR
11/29/1989Motion to strike disposedOverruled
11/29/1989Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief
11/17/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedOF TEXAS FORESTRY ASSOC., ATTY.- ROBERT T. CAIN, JR., P. O. DRAWER 1728, LUFKIN, TX 75901
09/15/1989Reply BriefRESPONDENT JACKIE GLYNN KIRKLAND'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PET'S OBJECTIONS TO MO TO STRIKE RESPONDENT'S BRIE
09/13/1989Motion to Strike filedMOTION TO STRIKE REPLY INCORPORATED IN PET'S REPLY BRIEF
09/13/1989Petitioner's reply brief
08/23/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/23/1989No description available.
08/14/1989Reply to Response
08/01/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/18/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
772 SW2d 226, 05-18-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
269th District Court
Harris
86-26386