judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8910
C-8910
08/01/1989
application for writ of error granted by Court
STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY
W. DAWSON STERLING TRUSTEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/06/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/05/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/20/1992Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Mounce & Galatzan, by William Mounce and Clyde Pine, Jr., Tx Comm Bldg., 7th Floor, El Paso, Tx. 79901-1334 915/532-3911
01/17/1992Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)of Atty Reese L. Harrison, Jr., Oppenheimer Rosenberg Kelleher & Wheatley, 711 Navarro, Sixth Floor, San Antonio TX 78205, 512/378-7504
01/13/1992Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)of Johnson & Gibbs, Atty-E. Russell Nunnally, 100 Founder Square, 900 Jackson Street, Dallas TX 75202-4499, 214/977-9000
01/10/1992Reply BriefRespondentreply to Stewart's response to Sterling's motion for rehearing
01/06/1992Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filedStewart Title's response to Sterling's Mo/Re
01/03/1992Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedSterling's reply to Stewart Title's Mo/Re
12/27/1991Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedon behalf of W. Dawson Sterling, trustee
12/27/1991Motion for RehearingPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filed
01/16/1991Reply BriefPetitionerReply By Stewart Title Guaranty Company To Response Of W. Dawson Sterling, Trustee To Stewart's Post-Submission Brief.\
12/13/1990Reply BriefRespondentDawson's response to Stewart's response to Amicus of Longley & Maxwell
12/07/1990Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Response To The Second Brief of Amicus Curiae Longley & Maxwell.
12/06/1990Reply BriefRespondentResponse of W. Dawson Sterling, Trustee, to Post-Submission of Stewart Title Guaranty Company
11/28/1990Post submission brief filedPetitioner
11/13/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Longley & Maxwell by Joe K. Longley, P.O. Box 12667, Austin
11/07/1990Reply BriefRespondentSTERLING'S REPLY TO RESPONSE OF STEWART TITLE'S REPLY TO AMICUS OF LONGLEY & MAXWELL
10/22/1990Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefPetitionerreply to amicus of Longley & Maxwell
10/10/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of the Law Firm of Longley & Maxwell, Joe K. Longley, 1609 Shoal Creek, Suite 100, Austin, Texas 78701; (512) 477-4444
10/03/1990Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerExhibits Briefs, with Enlargements in Exhibit Room
10/02/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Law Firm; Longley & Maxwell , 1609 Shoal Creek Blvd., Suite 100, Austin Texas 78701; Joe K Longley (512) 477-4444
07/18/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)ON BEHALF OF TEXAS LAND TITLE ASSN. BY LEE A. HUNNELL AND ROGER TOWNSEND OF FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, HOUSTON 651-5151
05/15/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
04/17/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)OF COWLES & THOMPSON, ATTY-NORTHRUP, 901 MAIN STREET, 4000 NCNB PLAZA, DALLAS TX 75202
04/13/1990Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/03/1990Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/19/1989Reply BriefPetitionerTO REPLY OF DAWSON DTD 9-18-89
09/18/1989Reply BriefRespondentRESPONSE OF W. DAWSON STERLING, TRUSTEE, TO AMI CUR BRIEFS FILED BY CHANCELLOR & WOOD & JOHNSON & GIBBS, P.C.
09/13/1989Brief receivedAmicus Curiae REPLY OF AMICUS GREENHILL & HEARD, 1600 SAN JACINTO CENTER, 98 SAN JACINTO BOULEVARD, AUSTIN, TEXAS 78701
09/11/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)JOHNSON & GIBBS, P.C., ATTY. E. RUSSELL NUNNALLY, 900 JACKSON STREET, DALLAS TX 75202-4499
09/08/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)CHANCELLOR & WOOD, EDMUND R. WOOD, 5728 LBJ FREEWAY, SUITE #200, DALLAS 75240 (214) 980-4500
09/08/1989Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefRespondent
09/05/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)JOE GREENHILL AND FRANK HEARD, JR., 1600 SAN JACINTO CENTER, AUSTIN 78701 (512) 322-2500
09/05/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)TX LAND TITLE ASSOC. FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, ATTY. ROGER TOWNSEND & LEE A. HUNNELL, 1301 MCKINNEY ST., HOUSTON TX
09/01/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)OPPENHEIMER, ROSENBERG ET AL., MR. REESE L. HARRISON, JR. 711 NAVARRO, 6TH FLOOR, SAN ANTONIO 78205 (512)224-2000
09/01/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)EDGAR W. MONTEITH, 1770 ST. JAMES PL HOUSTON TX 77057 (713) 877-1251
09/01/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)MCGINNIS, LOCHRIDGE & KILGORE, ATTY. FRANK OLIVER, 1300 CAPITOL CENTER, 919 CONGRESS AVENUE, AUSTIN, TEXAS 78701
09/01/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)GRAMBLING & MOUNCE, WILLIAM MOUNCE, P. O. DRAWER 1977, EL PASO, TX 79950 (915) 532-3911
08/16/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/01/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/06/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/05/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/06/1992Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date.
03/06/1992Mandate issued822 SW2d 1
02/26/1992Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedpetitioner's motion to return the record to the trial court granted
02/26/1992Returned document(s). See Remarks.Trans (2), Supp Trans (3), S/F (9), Partial S/F (3), Pltf Ex (3), Court Ex (4) Def Ex (2) returned to the trial court, fed ex to trial court
02/21/1992Reply to Response to Motionreply to motion to return the record to the trial court
02/20/1992Miscellaneous Motion"motion to return the record to the trial court"
02/12/1992Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
02/12/1992Both motions for rehearing disposed ofOverruledbehalf/Stewart Title
02/12/1992Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledbehalf/Sterling
01/20/1992Amicus Curiae Letter Receivedon behalf of Mounce & Galatzan, by William Mounce and Clyde Pine, Jr., Tx Comm Bldg., 7th Floor, El Paso, Tx. 79901-1334 915/532-3911
01/17/1992Amicus Curiae Letter Receivedof Atty Reese L. Harrison, Jr., Oppenheimer Rosenberg Kelleher & Wheatley, 711 Navarro, Sixth Floor, San Antonio TX 78205, 512/378-7504
01/13/1992Amicus Curiae Letter Receivedof Johnson & Gibbs, Atty-E. Russell Nunnally, 100 Founder Square, 900 Jackson Street, Dallas TX 75202-4499, 214/977-9000
01/10/1992Reply Briefreply to Stewart's response to Sterling's motion for rehearing
01/06/1992Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedStewart Title's response to Sterling's Mo/Re
01/03/1992Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedSterling's reply to Stewart Title's Mo/Re
12/27/1991Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
12/27/1991Motion for Rehearingon behalf of W. Dawson Sterling, trustee
12/27/1991Motion for Rehearing
12/27/1991Motion for Rehearing forwardedRECORD IN CLERKS OFFICE
12/13/1991Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordJUDG/CT APPEALS REVERSED; CAUSE REMANDED TO TC
12/11/1991Opinion issuedjudgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tcCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
12/11/1991Dissenting opinion issued.by J.Doggett joined/JJ.Mauzy & Gammage
12/11/1991Opinion issuedjudgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tcby J.Gonzalez; DissOp by J.Doggett join/JJ Mauzy & Gammage 822 SW2d 1
12/11/1991Opinion issuedjudgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tcby J.Gonzalez; DissOp by J.Doggett join/JJ Mauzy & Gammage 822 SW2d 1
01/16/1991Reply BriefReply By Stewart Title Guaranty Company To Response Of W. Dawson Sterling, Trustee To Stewart's Post-Submission Brief.\
12/13/1990Reply BriefDawson's response to Stewart's response to Amicus of Longley & Maxwell
12/07/1990Reply BriefPetitioner's Response To The Second Brief of Amicus Curiae Longley & Maxwell.
12/06/1990Reply BriefResponse of W. Dawson Sterling, Trustee, to Post-Submission of Stewart Title Guaranty Company
11/28/1990Post submission brief filed
11/19/1990Petitioner's reply briefPet's reply to response of Sterling to reply ot Stewart Title to Amicus of Longley & Maxwell
11/13/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of Longley & Maxwell by Joe K. Longley, P.O. Box 12667, Austin
11/07/1990Reply BriefSTERLING'S REPLY TO RESPONSE OF STEWART TITLE'S REPLY TO AMICUS OF LONGLEY & MAXWELL
10/22/1990Reply to Amicus Curiae Briefreply to amicus of Longley & Maxwell
10/10/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of the Law Firm of Longley & Maxwell, Joe K. Longley, 1609 Shoal Creek, Suite 100, Austin, Texas 78701; (512) 477-4444
10/03/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info.
10/03/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date.
10/03/1990Exhibits in case/cause filedExhibits Briefs, with Enlargements in Exhibit Room
10/03/1990Oral argument argued for Pet by Mr. Eugene J. Pitman and Mr. Paul J. McConnell, III for Resp by Mr. Thomas T. Hutcheson
10/02/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of Law Firm; Longley & Maxwell , 1609 Shoal Creek Blvd., Suite 100, Austin Texas 78701; Joe K Longley (512) 477-4444
07/18/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedON BEHALF OF TEXAS LAND TITLE ASSN. BY LEE A. HUNNELL AND ROGER TOWNSEND OF FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, HOUSTON 651-5151
06/13/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
06/13/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
06/13/1990App Writ Err reinstated to docket for reconsiderationCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
06/13/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
06/13/1990Amount of time allotted for oral argument.25/25-5 MINUTES.
06/13/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedPOINTS 8 AND 9 (PT. 1 OF MO/RE)
06/13/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedFiling grantedPET'S MO/RE. ORDER OF 3/21/90 DENY. APPLICATION WITHDRAWN AND APPL. GRANTED.
06/13/1990Previous Order of the Court withdrawnORDER OF 3/21/90 DENYING APPLICATION
06/13/1990Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
05/15/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
04/26/1990Motion for Rehearing forwardedRECORD REMAINS IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE
04/17/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedOF COWLES & THOMPSON, ATTY-NORTHRUP, 901 MAIN STREET, 4000 NCNB PLAZA, DALLAS TX 75202
04/16/1990Letter ReceivedREESE L. HARRISON, OPPENHEIMER FIRM, 711 NAVARRO, 6TH FLOOR, SAN ANTONIO TX., 78205 (512) 224-2000
04/13/1990Reply to Response
04/10/1990MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedREPLY DUE APRIL 16, 1990
04/05/1990Letter ReceivedWILLIAM J. MOUNCE, 7TH FLOOR, TEXAS COMMERCE BANK BLDG., EL PASO TEXAS 79950 (915) 532-3911
04/03/1990Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/03/1990Motion for Rehearing
03/21/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
03/21/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied(THIS ORDER WITHDRAWN ON 6/13/90 & APPLICATION GRANTED.)
10/12/1989Correction filed (See Remarks)CORRECTION TO PET'S REPLY BRIEF
10/10/1989Petitioner's reply briefREPLY BRIEF OF PETITIONER TO RESP RESPONSE TO PET'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR
09/20/1989Letter ReceivedON BEHALF OF JOHNSON & GIBBS, RICH D. BOSTON, 100 FOUNDER SQ, 900 JACKSON, DALLAS 75202 (214) 977-9641
09/19/1989Reply BriefTO REPLY OF DAWSON DTD 9-18-89
09/18/1989Reply BriefRESPONSE OF W. DAWSON STERLING, TRUSTEE, TO AMI CUR BRIEFS FILED BY CHANCELLOR & WOOD & JOHNSON & GIBBS, P.C.
09/18/1989Reply to Response to MotionOPPOSITION OF W. DAWSON STERLING, TRUSTEE, TO PET'S MOTION TO FIX TIME CERTAIN IN WHICH TO FILE REPLY BRIEFS
09/15/1989Affidavit ReceivedON BEHALF OF FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, AFFIDAVIT OF LEE A. HUNNEL (AMICUS CURIAE)
09/13/1989Brief receivedREPLY OF AMICUS GREENHILL & HEARD, 1600 SAN JACINTO CENTER, 98 SAN JACINTO BOULEVARD, AUSTIN, TEXAS 78701
09/13/1989Letter ReceivedREESE L. HARRISON, JR., OPPENHEIMER, ROSENBERG, KELLEHER & WHEATLEY, INC. 711 NAVARO, 6TH FLOOR, SA TX 78205
09/13/1989Letter ReceivedWILLIAM MOUNCE, GRAMBLING & MOUNCE, 7TH FLOOR, TEX COMMERCE BANK BUILDING, EL PASO TX 79950 (915) 532-3911
09/13/1989Letter ReceivedON BEHALF OF MCGINNIS, LOCHRIDGE & KILGORE, ATTY-FRANK OLIVER
09/13/1989Letter ReceivedCLYDE A. PINE, JR. GRAMBLING & MOUNCE, 7TH FLOOR, TEX COMMERCE BANK BLDG., EL PASO 79950 (915) 532-3911
09/13/1989Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedM/E/T TO FILE PET'S REP BR & TO REP TO AMICUS BRIEF'S
09/11/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedJOHNSON & GIBBS, P.C., ATTY. E. RUSSELL NUNNALLY, 900 JACKSON STREET, DALLAS TX 75202-4499
09/08/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedCHANCELLOR & WOOD, EDMUND R. WOOD, 5728 LBJ FREEWAY, SUITE #200, DALLAS 75240 (214) 980-4500
09/08/1989Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief
09/05/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedJOE GREENHILL AND FRANK HEARD, JR., 1600 SAN JACINTO CENTER, AUSTIN 78701 (512) 322-2500
09/05/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedTX LAND TITLE ASSOC. FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, ATTY. ROGER TOWNSEND & LEE A. HUNNELL, 1301 MCKINNEY ST., HOUSTON TX
09/01/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedGRAMBLING & MOUNCE, WILLIAM MOUNCE, P. O. DRAWER 1977, EL PASO, TX 79950 (915) 532-3911
09/01/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedOPPENHEIMER, ROSENBERG ET AL., MR. REESE L. HARRISON, JR. 711 NAVARRO, 6TH FLOOR, SAN ANTONIO 78205 (512)224-2000
09/01/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedEDGAR W. MONTEITH, 1770 ST. JAMES PL HOUSTON TX 77057 (713) 877-1251
09/01/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedMCGINNIS, LOCHRIDGE & KILGORE, ATTY. FRANK OLIVER, 1300 CAPITOL CENTER, 919 CONGRESS AVENUE, AUSTIN, TEXAS 78701
08/23/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/23/1989No description available.
08/17/1989Correction filed (See Remarks)CORRECTIONS TO RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
08/16/1989Reply to Response
08/01/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
03/06/1992Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STERLING, TRUSTEE, W. DAWSONRespondentMr. Rudy A. England
Mr. E. John Gorman
Mr. Roland M. Chamberlin Jr.
Mr. Thomas T. Hutcheson
STEWART TITLEPetitionerMr. S. Bradley Todes
Mr. C. M. Hudspeth
Mr. Eugene J. Pitman
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
772 SW2d 242, 05-18-89
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable ROSS A. SEARS
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
Honorable Michael O'Brien
83-67953