judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00918-CR
05-89-00918-CR
08/01/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Earvin, Jr., Cornell
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/23/1990Mandate Issued
07/23/1990Mandate Issued
05/25/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
05/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/1990Submission
05/22/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Submission
05/22/1990Submitted
05/07/1990MattConv
03/15/1990Brief Filed
03/15/1990Case ready to be set
03/15/1990Case ready to be set
03/13/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/13/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/16/1990Brief Filed
12/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/27/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/26/1989Transcript Filed
10/25/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/27/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/05/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable R. T. Scales
F89-96772-UJ
35 yrs TDC