judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANNY ARNOLD RODGERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0044)
Case Number:S-11-0044Case Docketed On:02/22/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:DANNY ARNOLD RODGERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANNY ARNOLD RODGERS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDanny Arnold RodgersDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Speedy Trial, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 158
Citation:265 P.3d 235

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/22/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/23/2011Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant, system posted incorrect due date for brief, changed.EventPhone CallFinal
04/11/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/25/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/02/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/13/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/01/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/08/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric M. Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Justin Daraie for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Justin A. Daraie, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/16/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/18/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/06/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/06/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/09/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/08/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal